Whitehead, Sara Jeanne (CPSO#: 65288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
61 Broadway Suite 1720
New York NY  10006
United States
Phone: 212-500-5720

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA JEANNE WHITEHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEHEAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2003