Whitehouse, Sandra Rosalie (CPSO#: 61756)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 22 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Aug 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Jan 1997