Whiteman, Donald Wayne (CPSO#: 24411)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Don W. Whiteman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: dwhiteman4@cogeco.ca
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017