Whiteman, Gabriel (CPSO#: 13699)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Dec 1952 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Dec 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1951 to 30 Jun 1952
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2000