Whiteside, Catharine Isobel (CPSO#: 29708)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2016