Whiting, Sharon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 52016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of the West Indies, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont.
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1605
Fax: (613) 738-4879
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Whiting Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Whiting ( CPSO# 52016 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH WHITING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1986