Whiting, Wilma Georgene (CPSO#: 52620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3237
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

10 Angeline St. North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
Phone: (705) 324-6111
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILMA GEORGENE WHITING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987