Whitmore, Nancy Ann (CPSO#: 58467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
156 Waterloo Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 4B4
Phone: (519) 271-6711
Fax: (519) 271-8533
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2030 Ext. 2113
Fax: (519) 631-4106
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Hasegawa and Nancy Whitmore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ANN WHITMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITMORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988