Whitney, Diane Katherine (CPSO#: 59603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 226
1139 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6M8
Phone: (807) 286-2450
Fax: (807) 623-8105
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Adult Mental Health
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6430
Fax: (807) 684-5870
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane K. Whitney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Whitney ( CPSO# 59603 )

Business Address:
226 - 1139 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6M8
Phone Number: (807) 286-2450

Business Address:
Thunder Bay RHSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6430

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE KATHERINE WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989