Whitney, Nermin Ayoub (CPSO#: 83004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 King Street West
Suite 401
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 273-9793
Fax: (905) 273-7054
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

12-419 Dundas St. E.
Waterdown ON  L8B 0K4
Canada
Phone: (905)689-2655
Fax: (905)689-4673
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nermin Whitney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Whitney ( CPSO# 83004 )

Business Address:
Suite 401 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 273-9793

Business Address:
12 - 419 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L8B 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 689-2655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NERMIN AYOUB WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007