Whittingham, Jennifer Mary (CPSO#: 82426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anesthesia
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6290
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Whittingham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Whittingham ( CPSO# 82426 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARY WHITTINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010