Whitton, Joel Lloyd (CPSO#: 26278)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 21 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Mar 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 May 2007
Summary:

 On May 22, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Joel Lloyd Whitton committed professional misconduct in that he has engaged in 
 conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. 
 Whitton's certificate of registration for a period of 30 days 	commencing June 22, 2007. 
2.	Dr. 
 Whitton appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Whitton pay to the College costs in the 
 amount of $2,500.00 within 14 days. 
4.	The results of this proceeding be included in the 
 register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 22, 2007

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joel Lloyd Whitton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Whitton’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Whitton has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.

See PDF for full undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)