Whynot, Andrew Scott (CPSO#: 59620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
428 St George Street
London ON  N6A 3B3
Phone: (519) 702-6271
Fax: (519) 439-8718
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Whynot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Whynot ( CPSO# 109426)
Dr. A. Whynot ( CPSO# 59620 )
Dr. S. Whynot ( CPSO# 109106)

Business Address:
428 St George Street
London ON  N6A 3B3
Phone Number: (519) 702-6271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW SCOTT WHYNOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYNOT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989