Whyte, Graeme Philp (CPSO#: 89382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornell University
Weill Medical College
NewYorkPresbyterian Hospital/Queens
New York NY  10017
United States
Phone: (212) 321-0607

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME PHILP WHYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2015