Whyte, Hilary Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 53145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neonatology
The Hospital for Sick Children
Room 3890
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6345
Fax: (416) 813-5245
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY ELIZABETH ANNE WHYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984