Wiatrowska, Beata Aleksandra (CPSO#: 64468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6772
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEATA ALEKSANDRA WIATROWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIATROWSKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 25 Dec 2004 to 28 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 29 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2006 to 11 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2007 to 11 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2008 to 11 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997