Wickham, David Michael (CPSO#: 52084)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Wickham`, David Michael (used until: 14 Feb 1991 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1991