Wickrama Arachchilage, Thamara (CPSO#: 89794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Wickramaarachchilage, Thamara Malkanthi Jayasinghe (used until: 27 May 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Colombo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 24 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THAMARA WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2008 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 24 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2010 to 24 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2011 to 23 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2018