Wideman, Anne (CPSO#: 68931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room A-112
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4942
Fax: (416) 480-6038
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE WIDEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIDEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1997