Widjanarko, Lianti (CPSO#: 51679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:Gadjah Mada University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Science North Sudbury
41 Ramsey Lake road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705 523 7100 Ext. 8107
Fax: (705) 675-4780
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Widjanarko Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 52126 )
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. Z. Saeed Kamil ( CPSO# 91326 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. M. Bonin ( CPSO# 58383 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 674-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANTI WIDJANARKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIDJANARKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984