Widman, David Stephen (CPSO#: 64946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Widman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2011


Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017


Corporation Name: Widman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014


Corporation Name: D. Widman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Widman ( CPSO# 64946 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100


Corporation Name: DS Widman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Widman ( CPSO# 64946 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID STEPHEN WIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993