Widrich, Guy Vernon (CPSO#: 65278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Promenade Circle
3rd Floor, suite 301P
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone: (905) 889-1761
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Widrich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Widrich ( CPSO# 65278 )

Business Address:
Suite 301P
1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 889-1761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY VERNON WIDRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIDRICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996