Wiebe, Arthur George (CPSO#: 28216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone: (519) 396-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arthur G. Wiebe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wiebe ( CPSO# 28216 )

Business Address:
1201 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 3C1
Phone Number: (519) 396-2600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR GEORGE WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2012