Wiebe, David Peter (CPSO#: 75403)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2001