Wiebe, Harold James (CPSO#: 64758)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Jan 1992 to 12 Feb 1992
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2006