Wiebe, Miriam Joan (CPSO#: 68054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East End Community Health Centre
1619 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1G4
Phone: (416) 778-5858
Fax: (416) 778-5855
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MIRIAM JOAN WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996