Wiebe, Patricia Karen (CPSO#: 71358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Canada
Postal Locator 1919A
Jeanne Mance Building
Tunney's Pasture
Ottawa ON  K1A 0L3
Phone: 613-858-6011
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA KAREN WIEBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003