Wiebe, Shannon Nicole (CPSO#: 87994)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Jan 2008 to 06 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Feb 2008 to 06 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2008