Wiebe Velazquez, Samuel (CPSO#: 60092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Foothills Medical Centre
1403 - 29 Street North West
Calgary AB  T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-8534

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL WIEBE VELAZQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBE VELAZQUEZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1993