Wiebenga, Marjie Lynne (CPSO#: 70098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone: (519) 318-1015
Fax: (519) 963-1880
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marjie Wiebenga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wiebenga ( CPSO# 70098 )

Business Address:
Core Family Health Centre
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 318-1015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARJIE LYNNE WIEBENGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEBENGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1998