Wielgosz, Andreas Thomas Julian (CPSO#: 27524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8153
Fax: (613) 737-8918
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pembroke General Hospital
Lorrain Clinic
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wielgosz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wielgosz ( CPSO# 27524 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
Suite W1676
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8153

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREAS THOMAS JULIAN WIELGOSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIELGOSZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1982