Wieman, Cornelia Gertrude (CPSO#: 66991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Suite 1114
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 30381
Fax: (416) 979-6815
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORNELIA GERTRUDE WIEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIEMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998