Wiener, John Solomon (CPSO#: 53042)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Wiener Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 30 Grey Road, Toronto, ON M5M 4E2
Date Received: 13 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016