Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Wiens, Andrew Stewart (CPSO#: 58346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6905
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wiens Lewin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lewin ( CPSO# 58356 )
Dr. A. Wiens ( CPSO# 58346 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 224-1248

Business Address:
Suite 207
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 224-1248

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW STEWART WIENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 1992 to 31 Jul 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988