Wiens, Doris Helene (CPSO#: 85291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
4th avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 7C6
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 45000
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Wiens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wiens ( CPSO# 85291 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIS HELENE WIENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2008