Wierna, Mariola (CPSO#: 60319)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 1990