Wiersema, Maurits Jan (CPSO#: 70858)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Indiana University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2003