Wiese, Edward Andrew Tony (CPSO#: 63990)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1991 to 14 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2012