Wiginton, Richard John (CPSO#: 58591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Main Street
P O Box 9
Brighton ON  K0K 1H0
Phone: (613) 475-1555
Fax: (613) 475-5556
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard J. Wiginton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wiginton ( CPSO# 58591 )

Business Address:
170 Main Street
P.O. Box 9
Brighton ON  K0K 1H0
Phone Number: (613) 475-1555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN WIGINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIGINTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Sep 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988