Wigle, Hannah Jane McFarlane (CPSO#: 97589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNAH JANE MCFARLANE WIGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIGLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016