Wigle, Ronald Denis (CPSO#: 22432)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart Street Kingston, ON K7L 2V7 Tel: 613 549 6666
Date Received: 12 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016