Wijay, Shamal Nishan Christo (CPSO#: 60764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: Wijayanayaka, Shamal Nishal Christo (used until: 13 Aug 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wijay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wijay ( CPSO# 60764 )

Business Address:
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone Number: (613) 841-7009

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAMAL NISHAN CHRISTO WIJAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1990