Wijeratne, Don Thiwanka Dilshan (CPSO#: 93946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D Wijeratne & N Waidyaratne-Wijeratne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Waidyaratne-Wijeratne ( CPSO# 93947 )
Dr. D. Wijeratne ( CPSO# 93946 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DON THIWANKA DILSHAN WIJERATNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJERATNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014