Wijeratne, Hennayaka Mudiyanselage Rasika (CPSO#: 93297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Sinhalese

Education:Medical Center of Fudan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasika Wijeratne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wijeratne ( CPSO# 93297 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENNAYAKA MUDIYANSELAGE RASIKA WIJERATNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJERATNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012