Wijeyasekaran, Singharetnam (CPSO#: 78637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala, Tamil

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: (416) 747-3617
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Siva Associate Medical Clinic
DSAMC
Suite # 1
1250 Castlemore Avenue
Markham ON  L6E 0H7
Canada
Phone: 905-554-9400
Fax: 905-554-9401
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Deerwood Creek Care Community
70 Humberline Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 7H3
Canada
Phone: 416 213 7300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Warden Woods Medical Centre
99 Firvalley Court
Toronto ON  M1L 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416-694-7400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Woodbridge Vista Care Community
5400 Steels Ave. West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9S1
Canada
Phone: 905-856-7200
Fax: 905-856-7215
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Wijeyasekaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wijeyasekaran ( CPSO# 78637 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Hospital Campus
Department of Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SINGHARETNAM WIJEYASEKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJEYASEKARAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002