Wijeysundera, Duminda Nalaka (CPSO#: 72422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Eaton Wing 3 -450
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8981
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wijeysundera Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wijeysundera ( CPSO# 72422 )
Dr. S. Johnson ( CPSO# 72469 )

Business Address:
Uhn - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3-450, Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Ground Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6417

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
Suite 2-0009
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUMINDA NALAKA WIJEYSUNDERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJEYSUNDERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004