Wilansky, Selig (CPSO#: 66450)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2005