Wilberforce, Kevin Charles (CPSO#: 54760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 3W2
Phone: (807) 577-3540
Fax: (807) 577-3675
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs Eckler and Wilberforce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilberforce ( CPSO# 54760 )
Dr. S. Eckler ( CPSO# 72595 )

Business Address:
456 Ferguson Street
North Bay ON  P1B 1X4

Business Address:
214 Main Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0

Business Address:
218 Frederica Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3W2
Phone Number: (807) 577-3540

Business Address:
125 Vickers Street South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1J2
Phone Number: (807) 622-2900

Business Address:
119 Cumberland Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4M3
Phone Number: (807) 768-2910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES WILBERFORCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILBERFORCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 06 Jun 1984 to 31 Jul 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985