Wilcock, Georgina Elizabeth Mary (CPSO#: 61570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1920 Ellesmere Road
Suite 309
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (416) 289-0519
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Wilcock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wilcock ( CPSO# 61570 )
Dr. I. Kitai ( CPSO# 57633 )

Business Address:
309 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 289-0519


Corporation Name: Ian Kitai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wilcock ( CPSO# 61570 )
Dr. I. Kitai ( CPSO# 57633 )

Business Address:
202 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 683-7593

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6268

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGINA ELIZABETH MARY WILCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILCOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1994