Wilczynski, John Steve (CPSO#: 54871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Wilczynski, Jan Stefan (used until: 12 Feb 1992 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Anne Wilson 5233 Stanley Ave Niagara Falls, ON L2E 7C2
Date Received: 06 Jun 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2017